Ripson v. Farhady

Defendant: United States of America and Parastoo Farhady
Plaintiff: Ila C. Ripson
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00572
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 11 Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/5/2013. Status Conference set for 12/18/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin.(Martinez, A)
September 27, 2013 20 Featured Case STIPULATION of the Parties Regarding Extension of Time for Defendant, Robert S. Julian, M.D., to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/27/2013. (Martinez, A)
December 16, 2013 24 Featured Case STIPULATION to Continue Pre-Trial Dates and Trial; ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/16/2013. Expert Disclosures due by 5/30/2014; Supplemental Expert Disclosures due by 6/13/2014; Non-Expert Discovery due by 5/30/2014; Expert Discovery due by 11/7/2014; Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 11/21/2014; Dispositive Motions filed by 12/8/2014; Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Bench Trial set for 4/14/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. The Status Conference set for 12/18/2013 at 10:00 a.m. is taken off calendar. (Martinez, A)
March 27, 2014 30 Featured Case ORDER vacating hearing date of March 31, 2014 and taking matter under submission signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/27/14. (Nazaroff, H)
April 1, 2014 31 Featured Case ORDER Directing Defendant United States to Produce the Settlement Agreement between United States and Plaintiff, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/1/2014. (Kusamura, W)
April 10, 2014 36 Featured Case Stipulation for DISMISSAL; ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/10/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
June 6, 2013 7 Featured Case STIPULATION to Continue Joint Scheduling Conference and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/5/2013. Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 6/20/2013 is CONTINUED to 7/25/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Martinez, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ripson v. Farhady
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Alyson A. Berg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parastoo Farhady
Represented By: Alyson A. Berg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ila C. Ripson
Represented By: James J Mele
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]