Morales v. Cribbs et al

Defendant: E. Henry, N. Pana, Karen Cribbs and Mathew Cate
Plaintiff: Joseluis Morales
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00591
Filed: April 24, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2014 11 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING First Amended Complaint Without Leave to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/22/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
July 10, 2014 14 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 13 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/9/2014. (Jessen, A)
August 6, 2014 20 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/6/2014. Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status should continue on appeal. (Jessen, A)
April 23, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER OF TRANSFER. Accordingly, this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. The Clerk shall terminate all pending motions and transfer the entire file to the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/22/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013) [Transferred from cand on 4/24/2013.]
December 4, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/4/2013. Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form). (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Morales v. Cribbs et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Henry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Pana
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Cribbs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew Cate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseluis Morales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]