Monroy v. Beard et al

Defendant: M. Lozano, Jeffrey Beard and Connie Gipson
Plaintiff: Francisco Javier Monroy
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00594
Filed: April 24, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court DISMISSAL ORDER signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 10/31/13. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
April 29, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis Without Prejudice (ECF No. 2 ), ORDER To Submit Correct Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis Or Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/26/2013. (IFP Deadline: 6/17/2013) (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application & Instructions) (Fahrney, E)
May 2, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 3 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/2/13: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Monroy v. Beard et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Lozano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Beard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Gipson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Javier Monroy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]