Dury v. Ciufo

Defendant: J. Ciufo
Plaintiff: Matthew James Dury
Case Number: 1:2013cv00595
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REASSIGNING ACTION to District Court Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/24/2013. New case number is: 1:13-cv-00595 AWI BAM PC.(Martin-Gill, S)
June 13, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court SCREENING ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT and Granting Leave to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/13/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form)(Flores, E)
July 30, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of 6 Action for Failure to State a Claim signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/29/2014. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 8/18/2014. (Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dury v. Ciufo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ciufo
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew James Dury
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]