United States of America v. Approximately $70,563.22 in U.S. Currency Seized From Mission Bank Account Number 3000288

Claimant: Helen Park and James H. Park
Defendant: Approximately $70,563.22 in U.S. Currency Seized From Mission Bank Account Number 3000288
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2013cv00602
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 49:781
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Amending Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/23/2014. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off 12/30/2014; Expert Disclosure 12/2/2014; Expert Discovery Cut-Off 1/30/2015; Non-Dispositive Motion Filing De adline 2/26/2015; Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 4/27/2015. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 6/17/2015 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Bench Trial CONTINUED to 9/14/2015 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
September 12, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/12/2014. (Jessen, A)
June 20, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 7/5/2013 by which claimants, James and Helen Park, will file a claim contesting the civil forfeiture action. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/20/2013. (Rooney, M)
July 12, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for a continuance of the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 7/23/2013 and CONTINUING it to 8/28/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. Telephonic appearances are granted with the parties to initiate a one-line conference call to chambers at (559) 499-5690. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/12/2013. (Rooney, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $70,563.22 in U.S. Currency Seized From Mission Bank Account Number 3000288
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Helen Park
Represented By: Ellis Park
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James H. Park
Represented By: Ellis Park
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $70,563.22 in U.S. Currency Seized From Mission Bank Account Number 3000288
Represented By: Ellis Park
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Heather Mardel Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]