Aguirre v. Gipson et al

Plaintiff: Louis Juarez Aguirre
Defendant: Connie Gipson, C. Rodriguez, Craig Hennes, Joseph Hurswill and Jarrod Foote
Case Number: 1:2013cv00604
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/19/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
December 18, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court First Screening ORDER, DISMISSING Plaintiff's Complaint, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, Thirty-Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/17/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint)(Fahrney, E)
January 27, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 13 Motion for Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/24/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
April 1, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/1/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
April 22, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of 16 First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/22/2015, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Marrujo, C)
May 2, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/2/13: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
May 3, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER To Submit Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis Or Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/3/2013.(IFP Filing Deadline: 6/24/2013) (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application & Instructions)(Fahrney, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguirre v. Gipson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Juarez Aguirre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Hennes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Hurswill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrod Foote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.