Picayune Rancheria of Chukchansi Indians v. Rabobank, et al.

Defendant: Reggie Lewis, Rabobank, Carl Bushman and Chance Alberta
Plaintiff: Picayune Rancheria of Chukchansi Indians
Receiver: Picayune Rancheria of the Chukchansi Indians
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00609
Filed: April 25, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Michael J. Seng
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1362 Indian Tribal Controversy
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 16 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on June 4, 2013. (Munoz, I)
June 11, 2013 26 Featured Case FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Motion to Intervene ECF 8 MOTION to INTERVENE filed by Picayune Rancheria of the Chukchansi Indians. This matter is referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within fifteen days, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 06/11/2013. (Yu, L)
June 28, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER to Adopt 26 Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/27/13. 8 Motion to Intervene Terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
July 19, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/19/2013. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
July 19, 2013 38 Featured Case ORDER TO CONFIRM DISMISSAL re 37 Order signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/19/2013. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Picayune Rancheria of Chukchansi Indians v. Rabobank, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reggie Lewis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabobank
Represented By: Thomas Frederick Gede
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Bushman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chance Alberta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Picayune Rancheria of Chukchansi Indians
Represented By: Lester John Marston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Picayune Rancheria of the Chukchansi Indians
Represented By: Geoffrey Michael Hash
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]