Moore v. King of Central Valley et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Moore
Defendant: King of Central Valley and Central Valley Group, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00611
Filed: April 26, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2013 10 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Reschedule Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/30/2013. (Initial Scheduling Conference previously set for 8/13/2013, has been CONTINUED to 9/24/2013, at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs complaint is hereby extended to August 30, 2013.)(Gaumnitz, R)
September 3, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER After Notice of Settlement 11 . This Court ORDERS the parties no later than 9/30/2013 to file appropriate papers to dismiss or conclude this action in its entirety. The Court VACATES all pending dates and matters. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/3/2013. (Herman, H)
September 10, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER Re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/10/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Moore v. King of Central Valley et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Moore
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King of Central Valley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Valley Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]