Moore v. Zinkin et al

Defendant: Shaw Street Books, Inc., Sandra Zinkin and DeWayne Zinkin
Plaintiff: Ronald Moore
Cross_claimant: Shaw Street Books, Inc.
Cross_defendant: DeWayne Zinkin and Sandra Zinkin
Case Number: 1:2013cv00613
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Stanley A Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time for defendants Dewayne and Sandra Zinkin to respond to the complaint. Said response is now due on/or before 7/16/2013. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 6/26/2013. (Rooney, M)
July 18, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension to Respond to Complaint: Defendants, Dewayne Zinkin and Sandra Zinkin Response due 7/23/2013 to Plaintiff's complaint. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/16/2013. (Herman, H)
July 24, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER for further extension to respond to complaint. It is hereby ordered that defendants response to plaintiff's complaint is due on August 5, 2013. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 7/23/2013. (Hernandez, M)
August 6, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER for further extension to respond to complaint. It is hereby ordered that defendants, Dewayne Zinkin and Sandra Zinkin, responses to plaintiff's complaint are due on or before 8/23/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 8/6/2013. (Hernandez, M)
August 26, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on stipulation for extension to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/26/2013. (Hernandez, M)
August 30, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Cross Claim by Shaw Street Books, Inc. against DeWayne Zinkin and Sandra Zinkin signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/29/20/13. (Lundstrom, T)
August 30, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS CLAIM ONLY AGAINST CROSS-DEFENDANTS DEWAYNE ZINKIN AND SANDRA ZINKIN signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/30/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
September 16, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION For Dismissal Of Defendants Dewayne Zinkin And Sandra Zinkin ONLY; ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/13/2013. (Fahrney, E)
January 7, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Amend (ECF Nos. 42 , 43 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/6/2014. (Fahrney, E)
June 30, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice Of The Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/30/2014. CASE CLOSED. ( Motions filed by 7/31/2014) (Fahrney, E)
July 22, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Request for Fees and Costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/21/2014. (Kusamura, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Zinkin et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw Street Books, Inc.
Represented By: Roger Jon Diamond
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Zinkin
Represented By: Nick Zinkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeWayne Zinkin
Represented By: Nick Zinkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Moore
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Shaw Street Books, Inc.
Represented By: Roger Jon Diamond
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: DeWayne Zinkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Sandra Zinkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]