Koenig v. Bank of America, N.A.

Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Philip Koenig
Case Number: 1:2013cv00693
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing date of July 1, 2013 and taking matter under submission. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/26/13. (Nazaroff, H)
July 23, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PERMITTING Filing of Surreply 18 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/22/13. (Hellings, J)
November 27, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference: Due to the pending Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 5), the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 12/3/2013 to February 19, 2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/27/2013. (Herman, H)
December 23, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 5 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend, and GRANTING defendant's request for Judicial Notice, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/23/2013. (Kusamura, W)
February 12, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Order continuing scheduling conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/12/2014. Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 2/19/2014 has been CONTINUED to 4/22/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Figueroa, O)
February 20, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing date of February 24, 2014 and taking matter under submission. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/20/14. (Nazaroff, H)
April 17, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference: In light of the Court's Order dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint with leave to amend (Doc. 24), and Plaintiff's pending motion to modify the order dismissing Plaintiff's complaint (Doc. 26), the Scheduling Conference currently set for 4/22/2014 is CONTINUED to July 1, 2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/17/2014. (Herman, H)
May 28, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/28/2014 denying 26 Motion to alter or amend order dismissing complaint and granting Defendant's request for Judical Notice. Amended Complaint due by 6/30/2014.(Lundstrom, T)
June 25, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference: Initial Scheduling Conference is continued from 7/1/2014 to August 19, 2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/25/2014. (Herman, H)
December 10, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint in the form attached to his Motion for Leave to Add Parties, Factual Allegations and Causes of Action, document 45 . Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint which is consistent with the Court's December 23, 2013, order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/10/2014. (Rooney, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koenig v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Carolee Anne Hoover
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Koenig
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]