Bludworth v. CSP-Corcoran

Defendant: CSP- Corcoran
Plaintiff: Timothy Lee Bludworth
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00728
Filed: May 16, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Referring Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/16/13: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
April 10, 2014 17 Featured Case First Screening ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiff's 12 Complaint, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND ; Thirty Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form)(Sant Agata, S)
May 15, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER OF TRANSFER to the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/15/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013) [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2013.]
May 21, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER to Submit Complaint within 30 Days; ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/21/13. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint Form, # 2 IFP Application)(Verduzco, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bludworth v. CSP-Corcoran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSP- Corcoran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Lee Bludworth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]