Segura v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Christopher Segura
Case Number: 1:2013cv00865
Filed: June 7, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to extend briefing schedule - Defendant's answering brief was due on 2/26/2014. The new due date will be 3/28/2014. Counsel for the defense apologizes for the delay. This is defendant's first request for extension. The parties further stipulation that the Court's Scheduling Order shall be modified accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/28/2014. (Hernandez, M)
May 27, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Social Security Appeal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/23/14. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
June 19, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 06/18/2013. (Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Segura v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Susan L. Smith, GOVT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Segura
Represented By: Kelsey Mackenzie Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]