Cleveland-Hayes v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Ana M. Cleveland-Hayes
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv00962
Filed: June 24, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to Voluntary Remand Pursuant to Sentence Six of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/25/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
July 1, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 2 ), ORDER Directing Clerk To Issue Summons And New Case Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/28/2013. (Fahrney, E)
July 30, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time 6 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/30/2013. (Hall, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleveland-Hayes v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana M. Cleveland-Hayes
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]