Diaz v. County of Fresno

Defendant: County of Fresno
Plaintiff: Jesus Diaz
Case Number: 1:2013cv01001
Filed: June 28, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Relate Actions, to Reassign Judges and to File Consent Forms, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/13/13. (Hellings, J)
January 3, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference Procedures signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/3/2014. (Martinez, A)
December 9, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation and Order continuing telephonic status conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/9/2014. Telephonic Status Conference currently set for 12/10/2014 has been CONTINUED to 12/17/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.(Figueroa, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. County of Fresno
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fresno
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Diaz
Represented By: James W Henderson, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]