Fuentez v. County of Fresno

Plaintiff: Edangel Fuentez
Defendant: County of Fresno
Case Number: 1:2013cv01003
Filed: June 28, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Stanley A Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Relate Actions, to Reassign Judges and to File Consent Forms, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/13/13. (Hellings, J)
January 3, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference Procedures signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/3/2014. (Martinez, A)
December 9, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation and Order continuing telephonic status conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/9/2014. Telephonic Status Conference currently set for 12/10/2014 has been CONTINUED to 12/17/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.(Figueroa, O)
April 6, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER Continuing Hearing on Motion to Determine the Preclusive Effect of Judge Wanger's Memorandum Decision re: Motions for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing (Doc. 35) is continued from 4/10/2015 to May 1, 2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/6/2015. (Herman, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuentez v. County of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edangel Fuentez
Represented By: James W Henderson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.