Gonzales v. Mims

Defendant: Margaret Mims
Plaintiff: Leonard Quiroz Gonzales
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01069
Filed: July 12, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2014 10 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING Complaint and Granting Plaintiff LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; Amended Complaint due in Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form)(Sant Agata, S)
July 1, 2014 12 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING 11 First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; Thirty Day Deadline to File Second Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/30/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form)(Sant Agata, S)
August 14, 2014 13 Featured Case FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that pursuant to 28:1915A and 28:1915(e), this action be DISMISSED, with prejudice, based on Plaintiff's failure to state claim upon which relief may be granted under section 1983, an that this DISMISSAL be subject to the "Three Strikes" provision set forth in 28:1915(g) ;re 11 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Leonard Quiroz Gonzales. referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/13/14. Objections to F&R due by 9/16/2014 (Martin-Gill, S)
July 18, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/18/2013. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application) (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gonzales v. Mims
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Mims
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Quiroz Gonzales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]