United States of America v. Barrera

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Bertoni Barrera
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01076
Filed: July 15, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court Petitioner's Notice of Compliance; ORDER Closing File, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/17/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
July 18, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING re enforcement of tax summons set for 9/4/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. If respondent has any defense or opposition to the petition, such defense, or opposition, shall be made in writing and filed with the Clerk, and a copy served on the United States Attorney at least 10 days before the date set for the show cause hearing. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/17/2013. (Rooney, M)
September 26, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS re: I.R.S. Summons Enforcement, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/23/2013, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Ten Days. Pursuant to Order, address of Mr. Barrera changed to 422 S. Gateway Drive, Suite 100, Madera, California 93637. (Marrujo, C) Modified on 9/26/2013 (Rooney, M).
October 10, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 8 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Enforcement of Internal Revenue Summons, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/10/2013. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Barrera
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Yoshinori H. T. Himel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bertoni Barrera
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]