Triumph Furniture Processing-Export Joint Stock Company v. Everest Furniture Company

Plaintiff: Triumph Furniture Processing-Export Joint Stock Company
Defendant: Everest Furniture Company
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01648
Filed: October 11, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/9/2013) [Transferred from cand on 10/11/2013.]
January 17, 2014 19 Featured Case ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/17/2014. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/14/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Martinez, A)
March 7, 2014 25 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE BACK to the Northern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/6/14. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Triumph Furniture Processing-Export Joint Stock Company v. Everest Furniture Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triumph Furniture Processing-Export Joint Stock Company
Represented By: Jeffrey S Benice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest Furniture Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]