Ahmadi v. United Continental Holdings, Inc.

Defendant: United Continental Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sara Ahmadi
Case Number: 1:2014cv00264
Filed: February 27, 2014
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 10 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/5/14. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
September 15, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/15/2014. Consent/Decline Deadline 9/25/2014. Pleading Amendment Deadline 12/15/2014. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 9/29/2014; Non-Expert 2/10/2015; Expert 4/28/2015. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 12/15/2014 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 5/11/2015; Hearing by 6/8/2015. Dispositive Motion D eadlines: Filed by 6/23/2015; Hearing by 8/4/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 12/1/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
November 14, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PROTECTIVE ORDER as Modified by the Court, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/14/2014. (Hall, S)
March 31, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 5 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/31/2014. Plaintiff has 20-Days to file and served an Amended Complaint.(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmadi v. United Continental Holdings, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Continental Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Todd C. Worthe(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Mackenzie C. Foellmer(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Ahmadi
Represented By: Salim Khawaja(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]