Brooks et al v. Darling International, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Linda Brooks, Donald Brooks, Donna Conroe, Allen Conroe, Darryl Munson and Kimberly Tapscott-Munson |
Defendant: |
Darling International, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv01128 |
Filed: |
July 18, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Fresno Office |
County: |
Fresno |
Presiding Judge: |
UnassignedDJ |
Presiding Judge: |
Sandra M. Snyder |
Nature of Suit: |
Torts to Land |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 21, 2017 |
Filing
82
ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to Close This Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/21/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
|
August 28, 2017 |
Filing
80
STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' stipulation for an extension of time to 9/8/2017 for plaintiffs to file an amended motion for class certification. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/28/2017. (Rooney, M)
|
March 31, 2017 |
Filing
74
ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 47 Motion for Class Certification, Denying Defendant's 51 Motion to Strike Resident Data Sheets, and Denying Defendant's 52 Motion to Exclude Expert Reports, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/30/2017. (Thorp, J)
|
September 1, 2016 |
Filing
63
STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Motions Hearing, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/1/2016. (Hearing on plaintiffs' 47 motion for class certification, defendant's 51 motion to strike plaintiffs' "resident data sheets," and defendant's 52 motion to exclude the opinions of David Weeks and Timothy Bowser previously set for 9/6/2016, is CONTINUED to 10/18/2016, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.) (Gaumnitz, R)
|
April 3, 2015 |
Filing
42
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/3/2015. (Rooney, M)
|
October 30, 2014 |
Filing
37
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/29/2014 ORDERING 29 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint is DENIED. (Reader, L) Modified on 10/30/2014 (Reader, L).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Brooks et al v. Darling International, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Linda Brooks |
Represented By: |
Nicholas A. Coulson, PHV |
Represented By: |
Ingrid M. Evans |
Represented By: |
Laura L. Sheets, PHV |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Donald Brooks |
Represented By: |
Nicholas A. Coulson, PHV |
Represented By: |
Ingrid M. Evans |
Represented By: |
Laura L. Sheets, PHV |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Donna Conroe |
Represented By: |
Nicholas A. Coulson, PHV |
Represented By: |
Ingrid M. Evans |
Represented By: |
Laura L. Sheets, PHV |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Allen Conroe |
Represented By: |
Nicholas A. Coulson, PHV |
Represented By: |
Ingrid M. Evans |
Represented By: |
Laura L. Sheets, PHV |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Darryl Munson |
Represented By: |
Ingrid M. Evans |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Kimberly Tapscott-Munson |
Represented By: |
Nicholas A. Coulson, PHV |
Represented By: |
Ingrid M. Evans |
Represented By: |
Laura L. Sheets, PHV |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Darling International, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Joseph M. Callow, PHV |
Represented By: |
Daniel S. Cho |
Represented By: |
Christopher Scott Hall |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?