Liljestrand et al v. Silberberg

Defendant: Mervyn Isidore Silberberg
Plaintiff: John Eric Liljestrand and Christie Liljestrand
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv00667
Filed: March 27, 2008
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Nevada
Referring Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2009 27 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 12/31/08 ORDERING that Motions 17 and 19 Hearing dates are reset to 1/20/09 at 02:00 pm in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Becknal, R).
January 13, 2009 47 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/12/09 re 28 ORDERING that the Black Box and the Restraint Control Module taken from the 2006 Ford Explorer will be maintained by Timothy J. Ruest. No party shall conduct any tests, downloads, or in any manner tamper with either the Black Box or the Restraint Control Module until and unless all parties have agreed upon further testing or until permitted by the court. (Duong, D)
January 22, 2009 51 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/21/2009. Parties shall disclose expert witnesses and their reports no later than 2/17/2009; disclosure of rebuttal expert witnesses and their reports shall be submitted no later than 3/17/2009. Depositions of all expert witnesses shall be completed no later than 5/1/2009. Pretrial Statements due by 5/15/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2009 at 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 8/11/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS). Plaintiffs' 17 Motion to Exclude Experts is DENIED. (Marciel, M)
April 1, 2009 55 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 3/31/09 per 54 Stipulation of Dismissal. Each party is to bear their own costs and atty's fees. CASE CLOSED(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Liljestrand et al v. Silberberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mervyn Isidore Silberberg
Represented By: Raymond R. Gates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Eric Liljestrand
Represented By: Ronald R. Haven
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie Liljestrand
Represented By: Ronald R. Haven
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]