Lyons v. Clinton, et al

Plaintiff: William E. Lyons
Defendant: Hillary Clinton, Archie Williams, Columbia County and New York State
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv00201
Filed: January 23, 2009
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Constitutional - State Statute Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court [VACATED per order of 1/5/10]FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/10/09 RECOMMENDING that action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute and for improper venue. Objections due within 20 days. (Owen, K) Modified on 1/5/2010 (Kaminski, H).
January 5, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/5/10: ORDERING that the November 10, 2009 findings and recommendations, Dckt. No. 10, are vacated. RECOMMENDING that this action be transferred to the Northern District of New York. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one days. (Kaminski, H)
October 22, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/22/09 ORDERING Plaintiff to show cause, in a writing due on or before 11/4/09, why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice or transferred to the Northern District of New York, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a). See Bennett v. Aurora Behavioral Health Care, 2009 WL 178489 (C.D. Cal. Jan. 26, 2009); Smith v. U.S. Dep't of Ed., 2007 WL 4357546 (N.D. Cal. Dec. 11, 2007). A failure to timely respond to this order to show cause will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice. (Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lyons v. Clinton, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E. Lyons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillary Clinton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archie Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]