Prasad v. Yates

Petitioner: Reginal Prasad
Respondent: James A. Yates
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv00980
Filed: April 8, 2009
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Constitutional - State Statute Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Referring Judge: John F. Moulds
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 7/29/09 ORDERING that petitioner's response to respondent's motion to dismiss is due on or before 7/31/09.(Dillon, M)
November 12, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 11/11/09 recommending that respondent's 06/26/09 motion to dismiss be granted; and this action be dismissed as barred by the statute of limitations. MOTION to DISMISS 14 referred to Judge Frank C. Damrell; Objections due within 10 days. (Plummer, M) Modified on 11/12/2009 (Plummer, M).
January 7, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 1/6/2010 ORDERING 31 Motion for Certificate of Appealability is denied; and the Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to the USCA for the Ninth Circuit. (Matson, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Prasad v. Yates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reginal Prasad
Represented By: Johnny L. Griffin, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James A. Yates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]