Pena et al v. Cid

Plaintiff: Ivan Pena, Roy Vargas, Dona Croston, Second Amendment Foundation, The Calguns Foundation, Inc. and Brett Thomas
Defendant: Wilfredo Cid
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv01185
Filed: April 30, 2009
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Referring Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 07/07/09 GRANTING 9 Stipulation. IT IS ORDERED that the time to confer and file a joint status report is extended up to and including August 19, 2009. (Streeter, J)
October 2, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 10/2/2009 ORDERING that this action is STAYED in its entirety pending the Ninth Circuit's en banc decision in Nordyke v. King. The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report to the Court within ten (10) days of the Ninth Circuit's order. (Krueger, M)
September 19, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/18/12: Designation of expert witnesses is due by 3/8/2012, supplemental list of expert witnesses is due by 3/29/2013, all expert discovery shall be completed by 5/3/2013, all dispositive motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard no later than 6/28/2013. (Kastilahn, A)
November 14, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/13/2013 ORDERING 56 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief is GRANTED. (Waggoner, D)
December 18, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/17/2013 ORDERING the parties to file a stipulation, within fourteen (14) days, as to how many of the 1,273 handguns on the roster contained in Exhibit A of 59 Declaration of Stephen Lindley are semiau tomatics, how many of these semiautomatics are center fire and how many are rimfire, and how many of these semiautomatics are grandfathered and not subject to the Unsafe Handgun Act's microstamping requirement; ALTERNATIVELY ORDERING the parties to file separate responses not to exceed two (2) pages, within fourteen (14) days, explaining why they are unable to reach a stipulation. (Michel, G)
June 5, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/5/2014 ORDERING The parties' cross motion for summary judgment are pending before the court 61 . Having carefully considered the parties' arguments in light of the current record, the court fi nds the record insufficient to render judgment, and so directs the parties to provide supplemental briefing on two issues; Simultaneous briefs, not to exceed 20 pages each and any factual support therefor are due within 30 days of the filing of this order. (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pena et al v. Cid
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Pena
Represented By: Donald E. J. Kilmer, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Vargas
Represented By: Donald E. J. Kilmer, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dona Croston
Represented By: Donald E. J. Kilmer, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation
Represented By: Donald E. J. Kilmer, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Calguns Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Donald E. J. Kilmer, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Thomas
Represented By: Donald E. J. Kilmer, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilfredo Cid
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]