Richards et al v. Prieto et al

Plaintiff: Deanna Sykes, Andrew Witham, Adam Richards, Second Amendment Foundation and The Calguns Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: John McGinness, County of Sacramento, Ed Prieto and County of Yolo
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv01235
Filed: May 5, 2009
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Referring Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/14/09 re 13 ORDERING that the time for Sheriff Ed Prieto and the County of Yolo to respond to Plaintiff's 8 First Amended Complaint on file herein is hereby EXTENDED to and including July 15, 2009. (Duong, D)
August 26, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Application and Proposed Order for Order Shortening Time for Notice and Hearing 31 . Plaintiffs' Motion to Continue or Suspend Hearing Date on Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 28 will be heard on August 27, 2009 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7. Any resonse to Defendant's Motion shall be filed not later than August 27, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/26/2009. (Deutsch, S)
September 1, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/31/2009. Defendants' 28 Motion to Continue or Suspend is GRANTED and plaintiffs' 18 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. All future hearing dates are hereby VACATED. Prior to issuance of 9th Circuit's opinion in Nordyke, no party shall file any Motion for Summary Judgment w/out leave of this Court. (Marciel, M)
April 14, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 04/13/10 GRANTING 38 Request; The stay on filing any Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication in this matter will remain in effect for a period of sixty (60) days following theSupreme Courts issuance of a decision on McDonald v. City of Chicago, supra, absent specific leave from this Court to the contrary. (Williams, D)
November 3, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER FOR FILING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/2/10. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend, currently set for 12/16/10 at 25:00 p.m. is VACATED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 5, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/4/2010 re 41 ORDERING that dfts County of Sacramento and Sheriff John McGinness is DISMISSED only. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees, if any. (Duong, D)
May 16, 2011 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/13/11 ORDERING 54 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied and 58 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. The Clerk is ordered to enter judgment in favor of defendants Yolo County and Yolo County Sheriff Ed Prieto. Civil Case Terminated. CASE CLOSED. (Matson, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Richards et al v. Prieto et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Sykes
Represented By: Donald E. J. Kilmer, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Witham
Represented By: Donald E. J. Kilmer, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Richards
Represented By: Donald E. J. Kilmer, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation
Represented By: Donald E. J. Kilmer, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Calguns Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Donald E. J. Kilmer, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McGinness
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Prieto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Yolo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]