Bhambra v. County of Nevada et al

Plaintiff: Harjit Bhambra
Defendant: County of Nevada, Clifford Newell, John Spencer, Yolanda Nemeth, California Highway Patrol, Robert Shulman, Dale Flippin, Hank Weston and Keith Royal
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv03124
Filed: November 10, 2009
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Nevada
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2010 37 Featured Case ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/2/10 ORDERING that the hearing on Plaintiff's MOTION for leave to file a first amended writ of quo warranto 25 and defendant Nemeth's MOTION for an order setting asside the Clerk's entry of default 30 is CONTINUED to 3/10/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24. Defendants shall show cause, in writing, no later than 2/24/2010 why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file an opposition or a statement of no n-opposition to Plaintiff's motion. Defendants shall file an opposition to Plaintiff's motion, or a statement of nonopposition thereto, no later than 2/24/10. Failure to file an opposition will be deemed a statement of non-opposition to the motion, and may result in a commendation that the motion be granted. Plaintiff may file a reply to defendants' opposition(s), if any, on or before 3/3/10. Nemeth may file a reply to Plaintiff's opposition on or before 3/3/10. The Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference currently set for 3/17/10 is CONTINUED to 6/16/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24. On or before 6/2/10, the parties shall file status reports, as provided in the 11/10/09 order 2 .(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 27, 2010 52 Featured Case RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/27/10 ORDERING that the actions denominated 2:10-CV-01248-FCD-KJM (PS) and 2:10-CV-1349 FCD-DAD (PS) be reassigned to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further p roceedings, and any dates currently set in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED; the caption on documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be shown as 2:10-CV-01248-JAM EFB (PS) and 2:10-CV-01349 JAM-EFB (PS); and the Clerk make appropriate adjustments in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Becknal, R)
August 16, 2010 53 Featured Case ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/16/2010. Defendant Nemeth's 30 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default is GRANTED. Clerk's 21 Entry of Default against Yolanda Nemeth is SET ASIDE. Co urt RECOMMENDS that defendants' 6 8 30 Motions to Dismiss be granted; plaintiff's 25 Motion for Leave to Amend Writ of Quo Warranto be denied; plaintiff's 3 Writ of Quo Warranto be dismissed for lack of subjection matter jurisdiction; and Clerk be directed to close this case. Within 14 days after being served with these F/Rs, any party may file written Objections with Court and serve a copy on all parties. (Marciel, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bhambra v. County of Nevada et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harjit Bhambra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Nevada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Newell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Spencer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Nemeth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Highway Patrol
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Shulman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Flippin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hank Weston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Royal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]