California Association of Rural Health Clinics et al v. Maxwell-Jolly et al

Defendant: David Maxwell-Jolly, Toby Douglas and California Department of Health Care Services
Plaintiff: California Association of Rural Health Clinics and Avenal Community Health Center
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv00759
Filed: March 30, 2010
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
0 Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 7/22/2010 GRANTING 13 Stipulation and Proposed Order; Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr. RE 12 Motion for Summary Judgment; Defendants' last day to file opposition is 9/7/2010; and Plaintiffs' last day to file a reply is 9/17/2010.(Matson, R)
August 30, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 08/30/10. Motion Hearing re-set for 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr. Opposition to motion due 09/22/10 reply to opposition due by 10/01/10. (Williams, D)
October 18, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court [WITHDRAWN PER MINUTE ORDER 24 ] MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 10/18/10: 12 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this file. (Kaminski, H) Modified on 10/18/2010 (Krueger, M).
October 20, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 10/20/10 ORDERING that plfs' 12 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; The motion is DENIED with respect to the issue of federal preemption; plfs have not shown that &# 167; 14131.10 conflicts with federal law mandates under the Medicaid Act. However, plfs' motion is granted with respect to their challenge to dfts' implementation of § 14131.10 without first receiving CMS approval of their proposed SPA . As to that issue, plfs are entitled: (1) to a declaration providing that dfts' implementation of § 14131.10 prior to receipt of federal approval of its SPA violates federal law; and (2) an injunction enjoining further implementation of § 14131.10 with respect to the subject adult dental, podiatry and chiropractic services until the State's SPA is approved by CMS. Clerk to close case. (Benson, A.)
January 25, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 1/25/11 relating this case with member case No. CIV. S-10-3465 MCE KJN. (Kaminski, H)
November 6, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/5/2014. Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED because § 14131.10 impermissibly eliminates Federally Qualified Health Center and Rural Health Clinic services from coverage unde r the Medicaid Act. Pursuant to Ninth Circuit's ruling, the defendants and all those working in concert with them, are permanently enjoined from enforcing § 14131.10 with respect to "physicians' services" described in 42 U.S .C. §§ 1395x(aa)(1)(A) & (3)(A) and 1395x(r)(2)-(5) for which State Medicaid agencies are required to reimburse FQHCs and RHCs in manner described in 42 U.S.C. § 1396a(bb). Plaintiffs' 51 Motion for Attorneys' Fees is GRA NTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The requested fees as to Kathryn Doi, Regina Boyle, and Doug Cumming are hereby GRANTED. The requested fees as to Frank Fedor, John Fischer, Karen Kim, Asha Jennings, Jennifer Shih, and Rachel Schock are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Court would reconsider plaintiffs' Request should they file a new Motion accompanied by appropriate documentation so that the Court may consider reasonableness of requested fees. (Marciel, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: California Association of Rural Health Clinics et al v. Maxwell-Jolly et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Maxwell-Jolly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toby Douglas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Health Care Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Association of Rural Health Clinics
Represented By: Kathryn Ellen Doi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avenal Community Health Center
Represented By: Kathryn Ellen Doi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]