United States of America v. 30.60 Acres of Land, More or Less, in the County of Sutter et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 30.60 Acres of Land, More or Less, in the County of Sutter, Pacific Gas and Electric Company and Steve Harrah, Sutter County Treasurer
Case Number: 2:2010cv00789
Filed: April 2, 2010
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
0 Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Referring Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358 Land Condemnation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 9 Application for Publication filed by United States of America, signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/14/10.(Kastilahn, A)
May 28, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER For Delivery of Possession, signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 5/27/10. All dfts in this action, and all persons in possession or control of the property, described in the Complaint in Condemnation, shall immediately surrender possession of said property to pltf upon service of a copy of this Order. (Kastilahn, A)
June 16, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/15/2010 ORDERING that case 2:10-cv-789 GEB GGH is related with member of case 2:10-cv-791 LKK KJN. Action No.2:10-cv-00791-LKK-KJN is reassigned to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr and Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows for all further proceedings. (Duong, D)
October 15, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT INEMINENT DOMAIN dated *10/15/10* pursuant to order signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 10/15/10 ORDERING that judgment is here by entered against the USA in the amt of $70,000.00, and that title to the interests condemned i n this action vested in the USA free and discharged of all claims and liens of any kind whatsoever on 4/2/10, which is the date on which the Declaration of Taking was filed, and the $11,700.00 estimated just compensation was deposited into the C ourt's registry; and that the US shall deposit the deficiency of $58,300.00 into the Court's registry. Thereafter, the Clerk shall distribute $70,000.00 by check made payable to Pacific Gas and Electric Company and mailed to: Ces ar V. Alegria, Jr. Attorney at Law, P.O. Box 7442, San Francisco, CA, 94120; This payment shall be full, adequate and just compensation for the taking of the estate and interests in the subject property. The Clerk is directed to enter satisfaction o f this judgment of record upon the payment to defendant; that the ninety percent of any interest earned on the estimated just compensation of $11,700 shall be paid to the US by check made payable to United States Treasury and delivered to the Of fice of the United States Attorney for this District, in care of the Civil Division Chief. The Court shall retain the remaining 10 percent of any interest earned on the estimated just compensation for the Court's registry fee. The parties shall be responsible for their own legal fees, costs, and expenses.(Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 30.60 Acres of Land, More or Less, in the County of Sutter et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kelli L. Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 30.60 Acres of Land, More or Less, in the County of Sutter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Harrah, Sutter County Treasurer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]