Fred v. Washoe Tribe

Plaintiff: Ronda Whiterock Fred
Defendant: Washoe Tribe of Nevada and California
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv00845
Filed: April 9, 2010
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
 
Nature of Suit: Welfare
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 01/20/11 ORDERING that the 01/27/11 hearing on the 14 Motion to Dismiss is VACATED; the motion is submitted on the record. (Benson, A.)
February 8, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/7/2011 ORDERING that plaintiff's 18 motion for summary judgment, filed January 31, 2011, is VACATED without prejudice to its refiling after the motion to dismiss has been determined.(Duong, D)
February 14, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/14/11 ORDERING that plaintiff file an opposition to 14 Motion to Dismiss filed by Washoe Tribe of Nevada and California, or a statement of non-opposition, no later than 21 days from the date of this order. (Matson, R)
June 9, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/8/2011 RECOMMENDING that Dft's 14 Motion to Dismiss be denied on grounds of lack of subject matter jurisdiction and exhaustion of tribal remedies, but be granted w ith leave to amend for failure to state a claim. Any ruling on sovereign immunity is deferred. Pltf shall file an amended complaint within 28 days of adoption of these Findings and Recommendations if such are adopted. Motion referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
August 12, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 26 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/12/11: 14 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed, but plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 28 days. (Kaminski, H)
October 13, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/13/2011. Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is GRANTED and attorney Harlan Wayne Goodson is ADDED for Rhonda Whiterock Fred. An Amended Complaint shall be filed by 12/23/2011. Mr. Goodson shall notify Sujean Park if he has any questions related to appointment. Clerk directed to serve a copy of Order upon Ms. Fred's counsel and upon plaintiff herself. (Marciel, M)
January 13, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/12/12: All current dates are vacated and the court will take no action in this case until prompted by a party. (Kaminski, H)
November 29, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/28/12 ORDERING that This matter is referred to the District Judge assigned to this action. All dates pending before the undersigned are vacated; The caption on documents filed in this action shall be CIV 2:10-cv-0845-JAM-AC.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 7, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/6/13 DENYING 43 Motion for Reconsideration. (Manzer, C)
August 13, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/13/10: 2 Request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue forthwith, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve within ninety days of the date of this order, all process. The Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff one USM-285 form for each defendant, one summons, a copy of the complaint, an appropriate form for consent to trial by a magistrate judge, and this court's status order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel is denied. Marshal. (Kaminski, H)
August 24, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/24/2010 ORDERING 8 Motion for Extension of time is granted; Plaintiff is granted thirty days from the date of this order in which to supply the U.S. Marshal with all information needed by the Marshal to effect service of process, and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal; and plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel is denied. (Matson, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fred v. Washoe Tribe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronda Whiterock Fred
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washoe Tribe of Nevada and California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]