Poston v. Nevada County

Plaintiff: Steve Poston
Defendant: Robert Tamietti, Jason Jones, California Department of Highway Patrol, Eric Wagner, Keith Royal, Donald E. Lown, Jr., Tamara Zuromskis and Clifford Newell
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv01349
Filed: June 2, 2010
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2010 11 Featured Case RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/27/10 ORDERING that the actions denominated 2:10-CV-01248-FCD-KJM (PS) and 2:10-CV-1349 FCD-DAD (PS) be reassigned to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further p roceedings, and any dates currently set in this reassignedcase only are hereby VACATED; the caption on documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be shown as 2:10-CV-01248-JAM EFB (PS) and 2:10-CV-01349 JAM-EFB (PS); and the Clerk make appropriate adjustments in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Becknal, R)
September 9, 2010 15 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/9/10 ORDERING that the hearing on deft's Motions, 12 and 14 , is continued to 10/27/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. It is further ORDERE D that pltf shall SHOW CAUSE, no later than 10/13/10, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to timely file an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to deft Tamietti's motion. Failure to do so will be deemed as a statement of non-opposition to the motion and may result in a recommendation of dismissal. Deft's may reply to pltf's opposition on or before 10/20/10.(Owen, K)
October 18, 2010 16 Featured Case ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/18/10: ORDERING that the hearing date of October 27, 2010 on defendants' motions to dismiss 12 and 14 , is vacated. RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed. Defendants' motions to dismiss be denied as moot and the Clerk of Court be directed to close this case. Objections to F&R due within fourteen days. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Poston v. Nevada County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Poston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Tamietti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Highway Patrol
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Wagner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Royal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Lown, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara Zuromskis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Newell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]