BCFS-Health and Human Services v. Wagner et al

Plaintiff: BCFS-Health and Human Services
Defendant: John A. Wagner and Michelle M Wong
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv02989
Filed: November 5, 2010
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/16/10: Plaintiff's currently pending Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is denied, without prejudice to renoticing said Motion, if necessary, after February 18, 2011. All oblig ations of the Parties pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, including obligations relating to discovery, will be stayed pending resolution of this dispute by the Parties or the hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, whichever comes first. (Kaminski, H)
March 4, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/3/2011 ORDERING this case is DISMISSED pursuant to FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Parties shall bear their own attorney's fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to close this file. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
November 9, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 5 . Signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/9/2010. (Deutsch, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: BCFS-Health and Human Services v. Wagner et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BCFS-Health and Human Services
Represented By: Melissa Ann Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Wagner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle M Wong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]