Reynolds v. State of California Department of Fish and Game

Defendant: California Department of Fish and Game and State of California
Plaintiff: John Reynolds
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01381
Filed: May 23, 2011
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Siskiyou
Referring Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2011 13 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/22/11 ORDERING that the Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/3/11 is RE-SET to 9/8/2011 at 10:00 AM in Redding (CMK) before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 12, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/12/11 ORDERING upon review of the amended complaint, the court also finds that it is appropriate for service on all defendants. Plaintiff shall effect service of the amended complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.(Matson, R)
July 15, 2011 19 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/14/2011. The pending action was brought to this Court by plaintiff who is proceeding in pro se. The 16 Motion to Dismiss is noticed for hearing on 8/25/2011 before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. The defendant is directed to re-notice its Motion for hearing before Magistrate Judge Kellison. The hearing scheduled for 8/25/2011 before Judge England is VACATED. (Marciel, M)
July 28, 2011 28 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/28/2011. The Scheduling Conference set for 9/8/2011 is VACATED pending resolution of defendants' 16 21 Motion to Dismiss and plaintiff's 23 Motion for Leave to Amend. (Marciel, M)
September 2, 2011 31 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/2/2011 ORDERING 23 Pltf's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint is construed as a request for voluntary dismissal of dft CA Dept of Fish and Game and, so construed, the requ est is GRANTED; the CA Dept of Fish and Game is voluntarily DISMISSED as a dft to this action, which shall proceed as against dft State of California ONLY; pltf may file further briefing in opposition to the motion to dismiss within 14 days of the date of this order, after which time the motion will stand submitted; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to update the docket to reflect Mr. Solomon's appearance on behalf of dft State of CA. (Reader, L)
January 18, 2012 33 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/17/2012 DISMISSING CASE pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. 41(a)(2). CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)
June 7, 2011 3 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/6/2011 GRANTING Pltf's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. (Zignago, K.)
June 7, 2011 4 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/6/2011 ORDERING the Clerk to issue a summons, new case documents and order setting status conference. The Clerk to send Pltf the summons, one USM-285 form and a copy of the complaint. Within 15 days, Pltf shall submit service documents to the USM and file a statment with the court that documents have been submitted. (cc: USM) (Zignago, K.)
June 16, 2011 7 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/15/11: The Clerk of the Court shall update the docket to reflect that the following two defendants are named in the complaint: State of California and the California Department of Fish a nd Game; re-issue a summons in a civil case, the undersigned's new case documents, and an order setting this matter for an initial scheduling conference and send plaintiff the summons, two USM-285 form, and a copy of the complaint. (cc: USM). (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Reynolds v. State of California Department of Fish and Game
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Fish and Game
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Reynolds
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]