The Arc of California, et al v. Douglas, et al

Defendant: Terri Delgadillo, California Department of Developmental Services, Toby Douglas and California Department of Health Care Services
Plaintiff: The Arc of California and United Cerebral Palsy Association of San Diego
Case Number: 2:2011cv02545
Filed: September 28, 2011
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1396
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2013 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/27/13 DENYING 59 Motion for Sanctions. (Meuleman, A)
July 1, 2013 119 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/1/2013 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 83 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
July 1, 2013 120 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/1/2013 ORDERING that Defendant's 53 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Motion is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs' First Claim for Relief, for in junctive relief under the Medicaid Act, but DENIED as to all remaining Counts. Because the Court concludes that the deficiencies of Plaintiffs' First Claim for Relief cannot be rectified by amendment under the circumstances present herein, no leave to amend that Claim will be permitted. (Zignago, K.)
October 17, 2013 129 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/16/13 ORDERING that Defendants' MOTION for Protective Order 107 is DENIED as moot. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 19, 2014 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/19/14 ORDERING that plaintiff's 136 motion to compel is DENIED. The denial is without prejudice to renewal of the motion if the Medicaid claim is reinstated and plaintiffs are granted permission to exceed the presumptive limit on the number of interrogatories. Defendants's 134 motion to compel is granted in part. Within 28 days, plaintiffs shall provide further responses to the interrogatories. The court finds an award of expenses is not warranted. (Kastilahn, A)
July 31, 2014 147 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/31/14. (Kastilahn, A)
October 2, 2014 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/2/14 ORDERING Plaintiff has failed to make a particularized showing as to the need for interrogatories in addition to the interrogatories previously propounded. Plaintiffs motion for leav e to exceed the presumptive limit on the number of interrogatories 149 , except as set forth below, is therefore denied; Plaintiff has withdrawn the motion to compel further response to interrogatory no. 8; Plaintiffs motion to compel 149 i s granted in part. Within fourteen days, defendants shall provide further responses to: request for admission nos. 8 and 9; interrogatory no. 1 as to any denial of requests for admissions nos. 8 and 9; interrogatory nos. 6, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15 to the extent these interrogatories call for information pertaining to the uniform holiday schedule and half-day billing rule; and interrogatory no. 10; Defendant shall supplement the responses to requests for production of documents to clarify whether any responsive documents exist that pertain to the uniform holiday schedule and half-day billing rule; The remainder of the motion to compel is denied; The court finds in the circumstances presented on the motion that an award of expenses is not warranted. (Becknal, R)
October 6, 2014 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Modify Scheduling Order and For Order Shortening Time in Which to Bring a Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 163). Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is set for hearing Friday, November 7, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7. (Deutsch, S)
December 13, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/13/2011 GRANTING 12 Ex Parte Application for Stay of Proceedings; DENYING 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 23 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice to being reinstituted when the instant stay is limited. Joint Status Report due within 60 days or upon the disposition of the matters set forth, whichever occurs first. CASE STAYED. (Michel, G)
October 3, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/3/12 ORDERING the Court declines to stay the scheduled depositions, and Defendant's Emergency Ex Parte Application 55 is also DENIED.(Matson, R)
November 21, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/20/12: Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Order to Show Cause re: Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. Plaintiffs' alternative request for a preliminary inj unction shall, however, be heard by regularly noticed motion. That motion is set to be heard on January 10, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom No. 7. HEARING as to 59 Motion for Sanctions and 53 Motion to Dismiss RESET for 1/10/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
January 16, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/15/2013 ORDERING that Exhibits A-C attached to the declaration of Brian Winfield, filed in this action at ECF No. 90 -6 pages 1-21 be sealed. The Clerk of Court is directed to seal the entire ECF No. 90 -6 and Counsel Rebecca Armstrong is directed to file the unsealed portions of 90 -6 as a new document entry. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Arc of California, et al v. Douglas, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Delgadillo
Represented By: Rebecca M. Armstrong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Developmental Services
Represented By: Rebecca M. Armstrong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toby Douglas
Represented By: Rebecca M. Armstrong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Health Care Services
Represented By: Rebecca M. Armstrong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Arc of California
Represented By: William Thomas McLaughlin, II
Represented By: Chad Wesley Carlock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Cerebral Palsy Association of San Diego
Represented By: William Thomas McLaughlin, II
Represented By: Chad Wesley Carlock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]