Monster Cable Products, Inc. v. Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation

Plaintiff: Monster Cable Products, Inc.
Defendant: Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv02975
Filed: November 8, 2011
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2012 11 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/5/12 ORDERING that Parties settlement discussions are continuing, but are unlikely to be completed by 3/9; therefore, should settlement discussions fail, the stay shall expire, Defendant's responsive pleading to the Complaint shall be due on 4/8/12, and pursuant to the Court's 11/9/11 Order the parties shall file a joint status report by 5/9/12. (Becknal, R)
May 7, 2012 19 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/4/12 VACATING 5/9/12 deadline for filing joint status report and Rule 26(f) discovery plan. A new deadline will be set, if necessary, upon this Court's ruling on Dolby Licensing Laboratories, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue. (Meuleman, A)
May 11, 2012 20 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/10/2012 GRANTING 13 Motion to Change Venue; TRANSFERRING CASE to U.S. District Court - Northern District of California. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)
January 11, 2012 8 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/10/12. Case stayed for sixty days. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Monster Cable Products, Inc. v. Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monster Cable Products, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Leonard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]