Nicholson v. Allstate Insurance Company

Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Alexandra Nicholson
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv03018
Filed: November 10, 2011
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 7/10/2012 EXTENDING Expert Disclosure to 10/31/2012; EXTENDING Rebuttal Expert Disclosure to 11/30/2012; ORDERING that all other deadlines, including the discovery cutoff date, remain in effect. (Michel, G)
October 2, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AMENDING THE STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 10/1/2012 ORDERING that all discovery shall be completed by 4/1/2013. Each party shall comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2)(B) and (C)� 39;s initial expert witness disclosure requirements on or before 12/31/2012. The last hearing date for motions shall be 6/3/2013, commencing at 9:00 a.m.. The final pretrial conference is set for 8/12/2013, at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 10. Trial commences at 9:00 a.m. on 10/22/2013, in courtroom 10. (Zignago, K.)
December 14, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/13/12 ORDERING: Initial expert witnesses disclosed by: March 29, 2013; Rebuttal experts disclosed by: April 26, 2013; All discovery completed by: June 29, 2013; Last hearing date for motions: August 26, 2013 at 9:00 a.m.; Final Pretrial Conference: November 4, 2013 at 11:00 a.m; A joint pretrial statement shall be filed seven days prior to the hearing; Trial to commence: January 28, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. (Becknal, R)
March 21, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 23 continuing dates signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 3/20/2013. Initial Expert Witnesses shall be disclosed by 4/26/2013. Rebuttal Experts shall be disclosed by 5/24/2013. The dates for completion of Discovery, for Motions, Final Pretrial Conference, and Trial shall remain the same as set forth. (Marciel, M)
August 8, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/7/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Request to Seal documents 30 is GRANTED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 18, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/17/13 DENYING 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Meuleman, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nicholson v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Megan Lynn Barker
Represented By: Jeffry Butler
Represented By: Cynthia L. Mellema
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Nicholson
Represented By: Jon S Allin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]