Meyer Manufacturing Company Limited v. Telebrands Corp.

Defendant: Telebrands Corp.
Plaintiff: Meyer Manufacturing Company Limited
Case Number: 2:2011cv03153
Filed: November 29, 2011
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/9/2012 ORDERING Initial Scheduling Conference Reset for 4/30/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Reader, L)
April 9, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/6/12 ORDERING that Defendant's Motion to Transfer 15 is DENIED. Defendant's MOTION for extension of time 21 is DENIED. Defendant SHALL file its answer to Plaintiff's complaint within five (5) days of the issuance of this order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 12, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 32 to postpone deadline and related dates signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/11/2012. Initial Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 5/29/2012 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK). Dates for meeting counsel, initial disclosure, and filing of Case Management / Status Reports, shall be proportionately moved back same number of days as Scheduling Conference. (Marciel, M)
June 1, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/31/12: Discovery due by 1/29/2013. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/29/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Jury Trial set for 10/1/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Kaminski, H)
September 27, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/26/12. (Manzer, C)
November 8, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/07/12 ORDERING that any rebuttal expert disclosure shall be made by 01/07/13. (Benson, A.)
December 5, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/5/12: Deadline to file motions to compel discovery is extended until January 11, 2013.(Kaminski, H)
January 14, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/11/13 GRANTING 56 Motion to Compel; the 1/29/13 discovery deadline is extended for the limited and sole purpose of deposing Joseph Lo; Joseph Lo shall submit to deposition in California, at a location to be agreed upon by counsel, on or before 2/25/13. (Manzer, C)
March 4, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/4/2013 ORDERING Motions 65 , 67 , 68 , 71 , Hearing Reset for 4/8/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Reader, L)
March 27, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/27/13 ORDERING that the 4/8/13 hearing on the pending motions is VACATED, to be re-noticed before Judge Nunley upon official reassignment. (Manzer, C)
April 16, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/16/13 RESETTING Motion Hearings as to 67 MOTION, 68 MOTION, 71 MOTION, 65 MOTION RESETTING Motion Hearings for 6/20/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Meuleman, A)
May 31, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/30/2013 ORDERING the following documents are hereby SEALED by this Court until further notice: Dym Declaration, Exhibit A:Excerpts from Bob Rae's November 7, 2012 deposition transcript; Dym Declaration, Exhibit B: Excerpts from Irene Tam's November 8, 2012 deposition transcript.(Waggoner, D)
May 31, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/30/2013 ORDERING the following documents are hereby SEALED by this Court until further notice: Maldonado Declarations and Exhibits 1 - 31, as detailed in this Order.(Waggoner, D)
May 31, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/30/2013 ORDERING the following documents are hereby SEALED by this Court until further notice: 1. EXHIBIT B: Excerpts from Bob Rae's November 7, 2012 deposition transcript.2. EXHIBIT C: Excerpts from Irene Tam's November 8, 2012 deposition transcript.3. EXHIBIT D: Excerpts from Dean Krause's December 10, 2012 deposition transcript. (Waggoner, D)
May 31, 2013 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/30/2013 ORDERING the following documents are hereby SEALED by the Court until further notice: 1. The Meyer Entities Reply in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment at pages 7, 8, & 15. (The M eyer Entities)2. The Meyer Entities' Reply to Telebrands' Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts at pages 7-8, 10, 14-15, 21-22, & 31. (The Meyer Entities and Telebrands)3. Michael A. Grill Declaration Exhibit E: Excerpts from Robert Rae 's November 7, 2012 deposition transcript. (The Meyer Entities)4. Michael A. Grill Declaration Exhibit F: Excerpts from Ajit Khubani's November 16, 2012 deposition transcript. (Telebrands)5. Michael A. Grill Declaration Exhibit G: Excerpts from Bala Iyer's November 20, 2012 deposition transcript. (Telebrands)6. Michael A. Grill Declaration Exhibit H: Excerpts from Dean Krause's December 10, 2012 deposition transcript. (The Meyer Entities)7. Michael A. Grill Declaration Exhibit J: Excerpts from David Willis' deposition on behalf of the Whitford Corporation, dated December 18, 2012 deposition transcript. (Whitford). (Waggoner, D)
May 31, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/30/2013 ORDERING the following documents are hereby SEALED by this Court until further notice: 1. The Meyer Entities Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment at pages 11, 12, 22, 2 3, 25, 26, 29.2. Anthony J. Fuga Declaration Exhibit 2: Excerpts from Ajit Khubani's November 16, 2012 deposition transcript.3. Anthony J. Fuga Declaration Exhibit 7: Telebrands Corp.'s ("Telebrands") produced documents TB0002507, TB0002568, TB0002573, TB0002588, TB0004781.4. Anthony J. Fuga Declaration Exhibit 8: Excerpts from Bala Iyer's November 20, 2012 deposition transcript.5. Anthony J. Fuga Declaration Exhibit 9: Excerpts from David Willis' December 18, 2013 deposition.6. Anthony J. Fuga Declaration Exhibit 11: Excerpts from Bob Rae's November 7, 2012 deposition transcript.7. Anthony J. Fuga Declaration Exhibit 12: Exhibit 523 to Bob Rae's November 7, 2012 deposition.8. Anthony J. Fuga Declarat ion Exhibit 13: Meyer Manufacturing's produced documents MHK607-6149. Anthony J. Fuga Declaration Exhibit 17: Excerpts from Dean Krause's December 10, 2012 deposition.10. Anthony J. Fuga Declaration Exhibit 20: Excerpts from Derek Schwartz's October 23, 2012 deposition transcript. 11. Anthony J. Fuga Declaration Exhibit 24: Exhibit 34 to Robert Barnett's December 17, 2012 deposition.(Waggoner, D)
June 20, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/19/2013 GRANTING 65 defendant's motion for leave to amend; defendant may file its amended counterclaims within 14 days of the service of this order; defendant's 67 motion to amend the scheduling order is GRANTED; Discovery is due by 9/16/2013; plaintiff's pending motion 71 for summary judgment is DENIED as MOOT. (Reader, L)
June 20, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/19/2013 plaintiff's 68 motion to strike is hereby DENIED. (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer Manufacturing Company Limited v. Telebrands Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telebrands Corp.
Represented By: Neil A. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meyer Manufacturing Company Limited
Represented By: Matthew Paul Vafidis
Represented By: R David Donoghue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]