United States of America v. 34,196 Rentable Square Feet, More or Less, at 3870 Rosin Court, Sacramento, California et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 34,196 Rentable Square Feet, More or Less, at 3870 Rosin Court, Sacramento, California, Clinton T. Reilly and Bank of America N.A
Case Number: 2:2011cv03467
Filed: December 29, 2011
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 40:258
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/26/2013 ORDERING that the Court CONTINUES the current Trial date to 6/9/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The Court sets a Final Pretrial Conference on 5/1/2014 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Hearing on the 86 Motion to Exclude is set for 5/9/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. A Settlement Conference is set for 1/21/2014 at 09:00 AM in C ourtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The parties are directed to submit their confidential settlement conference statements to the Court using the following email address: kjnorders@caed.uscourts.gov. Statements are due at least 7 days prior to the Settlement Conference. (Zignago, K.)
December 26, 2013 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/25/2013 ORDERING 80 MOTION For Order Modifying Scheduling Order to Allow United States to File an Amended Declaration of Taking filed by United States of America is MOOT. (Waggoner, D)
February 28, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL 122 JUDGMENT in Eminent Domain signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/28/2014. The full and just compensation payable by United States for taking of estates in subject property is $342,199.50 which sum is all inclusive.Judgment shall b e, and is hereby, entered against the United States of America in amount of $342,199.50. Pursuant to Courts 4/4/2012 33 Order, just compensation in amount of $342,199.50 has been properly paid and distributed to parties entitled to recei ve just compensation. Parties agree this payment constitutes full, adequate and just compensation for taking of estates and interests in subject property. Clerk is directed to enter satisfaction of Final Judgment as to defendants Clinton T. Reilly, individually, and as Trustee Under that Certain Clinton Reilly Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001.Parties shall be responsible for their own legal fees, costs, and expenses. (Marciel, M)
February 28, 2014 124 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered *2/28/2014* pursuant to 123 Order of Final Judgment in Eminent Domain (Marciel, M)
April 4, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 04/04/12 ORDERING that, based on 25 Stipulation, that withdrawal of the 11 disclaimer filed by Clinton T. Reilly, in his capacity as Trustee under that certain Clinton Reilly Family Trust dated 06/08/11 is APPROVED. Clinton T. Reilly, in his capacity as Trustee under that certain Clinton Reilly Family Trust dated 06/08/11, is REINSTATED as a defendant in this action. (Benson, A.)
April 4, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 04/04/12 ORDERING that, pursuant to 27 Stipulation, a registry check in the amount of $342,199.50 be drawn to the order of "Clinton T. Reilly, as Trustee Under That Certain Clinton Reilly Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001" and delivered to Robert R. Moore, Esq., counsel of record for Defendant, at Allen Matkins, LLP; Three Embarcadero Center; 12th Floor; San Francisco, California, 94111 (cc: Financial). (Benson, A.)
September 6, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 08/31/12 ORDERING that defendant Bank of America N.A is DISMISSED in this action; after this Order is served upon B of A no further documents in this case need to be served upon said defendant; B of A may be omitted from the caption of this case in all future filings. All other defendants remain in the case, which is to remain open. (Benson, A.)
November 1, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/31/12: Defendant's motion for a jury trial 40 is denied. Within twenty-one days of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint statement proposing dates for the court trial on compensation. (Kaminski, H)
November 14, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/13/12 ORDERING that plaintiff's 50 motion for order deeming Requests for Admissions to be admitted, is granted as set forth at hearing. Defendants shall respond to the Requests for Ad missions, in the manner explained at hearing, within ten days of the 11/8/2012 hearing. Plaintiff's 51 motion to compel production of documents and further responses to interrogatories is granted. Defendants shall respond to the interrogatories and requests for production, in the manner explained at hearing, within ten days of the 11/8/2012 hearing. (Kastilahn, A)
May 24, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/24/13 GRANTING the 5/23/13 ex parte application for order shortening time. The hearing as to 72 Motion for Protective Order is RESET for 6/5/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Joint Discovery Statement is due by 5/30/13. (Manzer, C)
September 26, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/25/13 ORDERING the court orders the parties to provide simultaneous supplemental briefs on the following questions: What is the effect of PBS Commissioner Dorothy Robyn's ratification (dated 6/12 /13) of the Declaration of Taking (dated 12/29/11) on this case? What is the effect of defendants' failure to object to the ratification? Has the time to object to the ratification passed? If the time has passed for defendants to object to the ratification, does the ratification relate back in time to the date of the original Declaration of Taking? Parties are to file their simultaneous briefs by 10/7/13. Parties may file any oppositions by 10/15/13, after which the matter will be submitted. Parties shall limit their briefs to ten pages each. (Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 34,196 Rentable Square Feet, More or Less, at 3870 Rosin Court, Sacramento, California et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lynn Trinka Ernce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 34,196 Rentable Square Feet, More or Less, at 3870 Rosin Court, Sacramento, California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton T. Reilly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]