Backus v. Placer County et al

Defendant: Placer County Sheriff's Department, Placer County, Edward N. Bonner and Placer County Sheriff's Deputies
Plaintiff: Bartley S. Backus
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00046
Filed: January 9, 2012
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/25/2012. Defendants' 11 Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time is DENIED as unnecessary. The Subpoenas issued by plaintiff on Andrew Baumback and Will Hafelfinger are QUASHED. The 5/10/2012 Hearing for 8 Motion to Dismiss is VACATED and the Motion is SUBMITTED on the record. (Marciel, M)
May 31, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER vacating 22 Motion to compel signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/31/12. (Kaminski, H)
June 4, 2012 25 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/4/2012 VACATING, without prejudice, Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Protective Order and associated Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2012; ADVISING Plaintiff that any further motions, filed prior to the determination of the Defendants' 8 Motion to Dismiss, shall be stricken. (Michel, G)
June 29, 2012 26 Featured Case ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/28/2012 ORDERING Plaintiff's 19 motion to arrest David Lawicka, is DENIED; and Plaintiff's 20 motion to arrest and prosecute domestic terrorists, is DENIED; RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed with prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; defendants' motion 8 and to strike be denied as moot; and the Clerk of the Court be directed to close this case. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these F & R's. (Reader, L)
March 5, 2012 3 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/5/2012 GRANTING plainitff's 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The 1 Complaint is DISMISSED and plaintiff is GRANTED 28 days from date of service to file an Amended Complaint that complies. (Marciel, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Backus v. Placer County et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placer County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placer County
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward N. Bonner
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placer County Sheriff's Deputies
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bartley S. Backus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]