Connecticut Electric, Inc. v. Pacific Coast Breaker, Inc. et al

Defendant: PC Systems, Inc. and Pacific Coast Breaker, Inc.
Plaintiff: Connecticut Electric, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01533
Filed: June 7, 2012
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/8/12 CONTINUING hearing on 15 MOTION to COMPEL Discovery to 12/12/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 19, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/19/12 ORDERING that the parties, by their respective representatives, hereby agree and stipulate to each of the terms and conditions as set forth in the Stipulated Protective Order. (Becknal, R)
December 6, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/6/2012 DENYING, without prejudice, 15 Motion to Compel Discovery; VACATING the Motion Hearing as to 15 Motion to Compel Discovery set for 12/12/2012. (Michel, G)
April 11, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/10/2013 DISMISSING this action with prejudice; ORDERING each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs; ORDERING that the Court retain jurisdiction, for a period of 3 years, ov er the parties and this matter for the limited purpose of enforcement of and/or resolution of any dispute or controversy (including all associated relief, remedies and/or damages, if any) involving the Terms Regarding Future Conduct, which are a part of the parties Settlement Agreement. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Connecticut Electric, Inc. v. Pacific Coast Breaker, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PC Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah F Sirias
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Coast Breaker, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah F Sirias
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connecticut Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E. Chase
Represented By: Vincent J. Allen, PHV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]