Hamilton v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Candace Hamilton
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2012cv02277
Filed: September 4, 2012
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/15/2014 ORDERING that plaintiff shall show good cause in writing, within ten days after this order is filed, for failing to file a completed consent or request for reassignment form. Prompt filing of a completed form will be deemed full compliance with this order and will discharge the order to show cause. (Reader, L)
November 19, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/16/2012 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 2 application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue process and to serve upon plaintiff the Scheduling Order and Order re Consent or Request for Reassignment for social security cases. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order upon the United States Marshal. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, plaintiff s hall submit to the United States Marshal a completed summons, a completed USM-285 form, sufficient copies of the summons and complaint for service of process. Within five (5) days after submitting the necessary documents to the United States Marsha l plaintiff shall file in this court a declaration stating the date on which the documents were submitted to the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal is directed to serve process not later than sixty (60) days from the date of this order. (Zignago, K.)
August 8, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/7/13 ORDERING plaintiff to show cause in writing within 10 days why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Failure to file a timely response will result in dismissal of this action. (Meuleman, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Hamilton
Represented By: John Steve Sargetis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]