Pickup, et. al. v. Brown, et. al.

Plaintiff: David H. Pickup, Christopher H. Rosick, Joseph Nicolosi, Robert Vazzo, National Association for Research and Therapy of Homosexuality, American Association of Christian Counselors, Jack Doe 1, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, Jack Doe 2, Jane Doe 2 and John Doe 2
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Anna M. Caballero, Kim Madsen, Michael Erickson and Sharon Levine
Intervenor: Equality California
Movant: Donald Welch
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02497
Filed: October 4, 2012
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2014 105 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/11/2014: The 1/29/2013 stay is lifted; a Status Conference is set for 10/30/2014 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; and no later than 10/16/2014 the parties shall file a joint status report. (Owen, K)
October 25, 2012 32 Featured Case NON-RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 10/24/2012 ORDERING 26 that case(s) 2:12-CV-2484 WBS KJN and 2:12-CV-2497 KJM EFB should NOT be related. (Reader, L)
November 21, 2012 67 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/21/2012 ORDERING 55 Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and also GRANTS Equality California's request for five minutes of argument on 11/30/2012; Equality California is directed to file on the docket its proposed amicus brief, in the form presented on 11/9/2012, by the close of business on 11/23/2012. (Waggoner, D)
November 21, 2012 71 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/21/2012. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED:1. The court GRANTS plaintiffs request (ECF 40) to appoint Jack and Jane Does 1 and 2 as guardians ad litem for John Does 1 and 2, respectively. 2. The court also GRANT S plaintiffs unopposed motion (ECF 5) to proceed using a pseudonym and for a protective order, as follows: a. Plaintiffs shall be permitted to proceed in this action using the pseudonyms John Doe 1, Jack Doe 1, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 2, Jack Doe 2, an d Jane Doe 2. The parties shall use the pseudonyms when referring to plaintiffs in all pleadings, papers, hearings in open court, and other statements and documents that are part of the public record. b. If the plaintiffs identities, addresses, or other identifying information are disclosed in any deposition, responses to interrogatories, or other discovery documents, then the party providing the information shall identify it as confidential. Pages in the documents, which contain the plaintiff s identities or identifying information shall be labeled, CONFIDENTIAL, and those pages shall be separately bound into a document marked CONFIDENTIAL. c. Before filing any pleadings or documents that contain the plaintiffs identities, addresses, or other identifying information, the filing party shall seek sealing or redaction of the pleadings or documents as provided for in this courts Local Rules. See L.R. 140, 141. (Andrews, P)
December 4, 2012 80 Featured Case ORDER denying 29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/4/12. (Kaminski, H)
December 4, 2012 81 Featured Case ORDER granting 24 Motion to Intervene signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/4/12. (Kaminski, H)
January 29, 2013 98 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/29/2013 ORDERING that the parties 96 request for stay is GRANTED. CASE STAYED. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pickup, et. al. v. Brown, et. al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David H. Pickup
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Represented By: Rena M. Lindevaldsen, PHV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher H. Rosick
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Represented By: Rena M. Lindevaldsen, PHV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Nicolosi
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Represented By: Rena M. Lindevaldsen, PHV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Vazzo
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Represented By: Rena M. Lindevaldsen, PHV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Association for Research and Therapy of Homosexuality
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Represented By: Rena M. Lindevaldsen, PHV
Represented By: Stephen M Crampton, PHV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Association of Christian Counselors
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Represented By: Rena M. Lindevaldsen, PHV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Doe 1
Represented By: Rena M. Lindevaldsen, PHV
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Represented By: Rena M. Lindevaldsen, PHV
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 1
Represented By: Rena M. Lindevaldsen, PHV
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Doe 2
Represented By: Rena M. Lindevaldsen, PHV
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 2
Represented By: Rena M. Lindevaldsen, PHV
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 2
Represented By: Rena M. Lindevaldsen, PHV
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown
Represented By: Paul Evan Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna M. Caballero
Represented By: Paul Evan Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Madsen
Represented By: Paul Evan Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Erickson
Represented By: Paul Evan Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Levine
Represented By: Paul Evan Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Equality California
Represented By: Bram Marshall Alden
Represented By: David C Dinielli
Represented By: Michelle Friedland
Represented By: Lika Cynthia Miyake
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Donald Welch
Represented By: Kevin Trent Snider
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]