Truthout v. Department of Justice

Defendant: Department of Justice
Plaintiff: Truthout
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02601
Filed: October 18, 2012
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
 
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/23/2013 ORDERING further Status Conference SET for 4/1/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; parties shall file updated status reports no later than 3/18/2013. (Waggoner, D)
July 3, 2013 25 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/2/2013 ORDERING 24 Dispositive Motion re Summary Judgment Motion EXTENDED to 9/9/2013; plaintiff shall respond to the motion by 10/7/2013; defendant reply by 10/21/2013. (Reader, L)
September 12, 2013 30 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/11/13 ORDERING that the Plaintiff file a brief in support of the requested redaction and sealing no later than 10/14/13; the Clerk is directed to maintain ECF 27-2 in redacted form and ECF 27-3 and 27-14 under seal until such time as the court orders otherwise. (Manzer, C)
September 19, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/18/13 CONTINUING hearing as to 27 Motion for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing reset for 12/9/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Manzer, C)
October 9, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/8/13 ORDERING that all hearing dates and filing dates in this matter are VACATED. When defendant and its counsel are permitted to resume their duties in this case, the parties are DIRECTED to meet-and -confer and submit a joint stipulation setting forth a proposed schedule for (i) the hearing on the summary judgment motion, (ii) the hearing on the proposed motion to intervene, and (iii) submission of any briefs that remain due on these motions. (Kastilahn, A)
November 1, 2013 39 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER RE: REDACTION AND SEALING signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/1/2013 ORDERING that the 28 Motion to Seal is WITHDRAWN. (Zignago, K.)
November 1, 2013 40 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER RE: HEARING AND BRIEFING signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/1/2013 ORDERING that the hearing on 27 Motion for Summary Judgment is set for 2/10/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Opposition is due 11/18/2013. Reply is due 1/6/2014. (Zignago, K.)
November 25, 2013 45 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER 44 signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/22/13 ORDERING that the hearing on defendant's 27 motion for summary judgment is CONTINUED to 3/17/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Opposition is due by 12/4/2013. Reply, if any, is due by 1/21/2014. (Kastilahn, A)
December 6, 2013 47 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/6/2013 ORDERING that Plaintiff is GRANTED an enlargement of time, to and including 12/10/2013, within which to file its Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Zignago, K.)
December 12, 2013 49 Featured Case ORDER granting 48 Motion to Stay re 27 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/12/13. (Kaminski, H)
January 29, 2014 59 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER 57 to vacate 1/31/2014 50 Motion Hearing date signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/28/2014. (Marciel, M)
March 7, 2014 60 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/7/2014 VACATING the 3/17/2014 27 Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing. An order will be forthcoming. (Donati, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Truthout v. Department of Justice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truthout
Represented By: Kelly Brian McClanahan, PHV
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Lynch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]