Grinols et al v. Electoral College et al

Plaintiff: James Grinols, Robert Odden, Edward Noonan, Keith Judd and Thomas Gregory MacLeran
Defendant: Governor of California, Secretary of State of California, U.S. Congress, Electoral College, President of the Senate and Barack Hussein Obama
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02997
Filed: December 12, 2012
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yuba
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2013 103 Featured Case ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/26/2013 DENYING 93 Motion for Reconsideration. (Donati, J)
April 4, 2013 117 Featured Case ORDER vacating the 4/18/2013 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (ECF No. 71 and 72) and continuing the Motions for oral argument to 4/22/2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7. Plaintiffs' 4/18/2013 Motion to Recuse (ECF No. 102) is vacated and will be reset if necessary. (Deutsch, S)
April 4, 2013 118 Featured Case ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Reconsideration (ECF No. 97). (Deutsch, S)
May 23, 2013 127 Featured Case MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/23/2013 GRANTING 71 & 73 Motions to Dismiss without leave to amend. The court DISMISSED without leave to amend Plaintiffs' claim for declaratory relief arising out of Pr esident Obama's alleged ineligibility for office. Having dismissed the only federal claim asserted by Plaintiffs in their first amended complaint, the court DECLINES to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining state-law claim and DISMISSES that claim without prejudice. All other pending motions, including 102 Motion to Recuse Counsel are DENIED as moot. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
January 2, 2013 47 Featured Case ORDER regarding oral arguments at the January 3, 2013 Motion Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/2/2013. (Deutsch, S)
January 16, 2013 52 Featured Case ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 12 . Signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/16/2013. (Deutsch, S)
January 18, 2013 55 Featured Case ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/17/2013 ORDERING that Defendant's 27 Ex Parte Motion to Extend the Time for Responding to Plaintiffs' Subpoenas is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to modify their subpoenas in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 45, allowing Defendants a reasonable amount of time to comply. (Zignago, K.)
December 14, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/14/12 DENYING Plaintiffs' 2 Request. If the parties wish to proceed with their request for a temporary restraining order, they are hereby ordered to file the documents listed in this order by 12/21/12. (Manzer, C)
March 11, 2013 92 Featured Case ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/11/13 DENYING 64 Motion for Default Judgment and 76 Motion to Stay. (Manzer, C)
March 19, 2013 98 Featured Case ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 3/14/13: The Court directs Plaintiffs' counsel to both the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Eastern District of California's Local Rules. Chambers staff will disregard all communication that does not comply with both sets of rules. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Grinols et al v. Electoral College et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Grinols
Represented By: Orly Taitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Odden
Represented By: Orly Taitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Noonan
Represented By: Orly Taitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Judd
Represented By: Orly Taitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Gregory MacLeran
Represented By: Orly Taitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor of California
Represented By: George Michael Waters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State of California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Congress
Represented By: Edward A Olsen, GOVT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electoral College
Represented By: Edward A Olsen, GOVT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President of the Senate
Represented By: Edward A Olsen, GOVT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barack Hussein Obama
Represented By: Edward A Olsen, GOVT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]