Capitol Commission Inc. v. Capitol Ministries

Unknown: David Duran
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Capitol Ministries
Plaintiff: Capitol Commission Inc.
Defendant: Capitol Ministries
Thirdparty_defendant: John E. Anderson, Jr., George H Jackson, James E. Young and Daniel File
 
Case Number: 2:2012mc00093
Filed: November 15, 2012
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/7/2013 ORDERING 1 The 1/9/2013 hearing on the defendant's motion is VACATED and the defendant's motion to compel the production of documents is DENIED without prejudice. (Reader, L)
January 29, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/29/2013 ORDERING that no later than 2/1/2013, defendant shall clarify the number of documents at issue on the motion. No later than 2/5/2013, non-party David Duran shall submit the documents at issue to the chambers of the undersigned for in camera review. (Zignago, K.)
February 8, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/8/13 VACATING hearing date of 2/20/13 on defendant's motion to compel and GRANTING 15 Motion to Compel. The documents identified in the revised privilege log, dated 2/4/13, shall be produced within 14 days from the date of this order. Documents produced pursuant to this order shall be used solely for purposes of the underlying litigation. (Meuleman, A)
December 6, 2012 5 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/6/2012 ORDERING that the hearing re 1 Motion to Compel is CONTINUED to 1/9/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Capitol Commission Inc. v. Capitol Ministries
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: David Duran
Represented By: Stephen W. Reed
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Capitol Ministries
Represented By: Anthony J Biller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Commission Inc.
Represented By: Anthony J Biller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Ministries
Represented By: Stephen J Greene, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: John E. Anderson, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony J Biller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: George H Jackson
Represented By: Anthony J Biller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: James E. Young
Represented By: Anthony J Biller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Daniel File
Represented By: Anthony J Biller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]