Stutzman et al. v. Armstrong, et al.

Defendant: Random House, Inc., The Berkley Publishing Group, Crown Publishing Group, Lance Armstrong, Broadway Books, G.P. Putnam's Sons and Penguin Group (USA), Inc.
Plaintiff: Rob Stutzman and Jonathan Wheeler
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00116
Filed: January 22, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2013 106 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/30/13: HEARING as to 37 , 41 , 46 , 53 and 56 Motions to Dismiss RESET for 12/5/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
September 10, 2013 107 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/9/2013 ORDERING that Defendant Random Houses Anti-SLAPP Motion Strike 36 is GRANTED as to each of Plaintiffs causes of action. Defendant Penguin's Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike 42 is GRANTED as to each of Plaintiffs' causes of action. Defendant Armstrong's Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike 47 is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs' First, Second, Third, Fourth, Fifth, and Sixth causes of action. Defendant Weisel& #039;s Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike 55 is GRANTED as to each of Plaintiffs' causes of action. Defendant Stapleton's Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike 57 is GRANTED as to each of Plaintiffs' causes of action. The pending Motions to Dismis s 37 , 41 , 53 , 56 by Defendant Random House, Defendant Penguin, Defendant Weisel, and Defendant Stapleton are DENIED AS MOOT. The pending Motion to Dismiss 46 by Defendant Lance Armstrong is DENIED AS MOOT as to Plaintiffs' First, Seco nd, Third, Fourth, Fifth, and Sixth causes of action. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. If no amended complaint is filed, the causes of action stricken by this Order shall be dismissed with prejudice without further notice to the parties. (Zignago, K.)
March 28, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/27/13: Motions in Response to Amended Complaint due by 4/26/2013. Replies due by 6/17/2013. Responses due by 7/12/2013. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/27/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Manzer, C)
June 6, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/5/13 ORDERING Motion Hearings for 56 , 41 , 53 , 37 , 36 , 47 , 46 , 57 , 55 , 42 RESCHEDULED to 8/8/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr. The Court ORDERS the following briefing schedule as to defendants Weisel and Stapleton: Defendants Weisel and Stapleton shall file the Subject Motions, and papers in support thereof, on or before 7/18/13; Plaintiffs shall file their briefs and other papers in opposition to the Subject Motions on or before 7/25/13; and Defendants Weisel and Stapleton shall file their reply briefs and other papers in further support of the Subject Motions on or before 8/1/13. (Meuleman, A)
July 30, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/29/2013 ORDERING 93 that Marc S. Harris request to appear telephonically is GRANTED. Counsel shall contact the undersigned's courtroom deputy and provide a landline number at which he can be reached at the time of the hearing. (Reader, L)
July 31, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/31/13 ORDERING that Henry H. Rossbacher's REQUEST to appear telephonically is GRANTED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 2, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/2/13 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel 61 , 69 is DENIED without prejudice. (Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Stutzman et al. v. Armstrong, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Random House, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Berkley Publishing Group
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Publishing Group
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Armstrong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadway Books
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.P. Putnam's Sons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penguin Group (USA), Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob Stutzman
Represented By: Tracey Stevens Buck-Walsh
Represented By: Kevin Roddy
Represented By: Clyde Talbot Turner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Wheeler
Represented By: Tracey Stevens Buck-Walsh
Represented By: Kevin Roddy
Represented By: Clyde Talbot Turner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]