United States of America v. 2006 BMW 750Li, VIN: WBAHN83506DT30035, License Number: 5RLP132

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 2006 BMW 750Li, VIN: WBAHN83506DT30035, License Number: 5RLP132
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00194
Filed: February 1, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/12/13 ORDERING for the reasons set forth above, this matter is stayed pending the resolution of the related criminal case. The parties will file a joint request to lift the stay within thirty days of the criminal case's conclusion. (Becknal, R)
February 4, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/1/13 ORDERING that the Clerk issue a Warrant for Arrest of Articles in Rem for the defendant vehicle. (Kastilahn, A)
February 7, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/6/13 ORDERING that the government shall promptly file an updated Application clarifying the name of the publication in which notice of this action was previously published October 4, 11 and 18, 2012.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 12, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/11/2013. (Zignago, K.)
February 20, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/19/13. Because the cases are already assigned to the same district judge, this Order is issued for informational purposes only and shall have no effect on the status of the cases.(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. 2006 BMW 750Li, VIN: WBAHN83506DT30035, License Number: 5RLP132
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2006 BMW 750Li, VIN: WBAHN83506DT30035, License Number: 5RLP132
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]