Dick v. American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc., et al

Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc.;, Ameriquest Mortgage Co., Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank National Trust, Town and Country Title Services, Citi Residential Lending, Homeward Residential, Inc. and Power Default Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gabriel Dick and Jill Dick
Case Number: 2:2013cv00201
Filed: February 5, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Nevada
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/20/2013 granting 19 Request by Town and Country Title Services' counsel to appear by telephone at the 7/15/2013, 2:00 PM motion hearing. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
June 25, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/25/2013 granting 24 Request filed by Citi Residential Lending to appear telephonically on July 15, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. The courtroom deputy shall e-mail counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
July 12, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/12/2013 granting 22 counsel for defendants Bruce Bauer's request to appear by telephone at the 7/15/2013 hearing on the motion to withdraw reference at 2:00 PM. The Courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
September 18, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting 33 Motion to Dismiss signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/18/13: Plaintiffs have twenty days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint, if they can do so consistent with this Order. (Kaminski, H)
March 27, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Defendants' Request for Permission to appear telephonically at Motion Hearing on 4/8/2013 at 2:00 p.m., signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/27/2013. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 6, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/6/2014 granting 67 Defendant Citi Residential Lending's request to appear by telephone at the hearing on the motions to dismiss now set for 1/13/2014 at 2:00 p.m. The courtroom deputy shall e-mail counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephonic hearing. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 15, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/14/2014 GRANTING 57 , 62 Motions to Dismiss; DISMISSING all claims with prejudice and without leave to amend; CASE CLOSED. (cc: Bankruptcy Judge Klein, Bankruptcy Clerk Sacramento) (Michel, G)
April 4, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/4/13 ORDERING that Opposition, if any, to the Motion to withdraw reference shall be filed no later than 5/1/2013. Reply, if any, shall be filed no later than 5/15/2013. The matter shall thereafter stand submitted.(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dick v. American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc.;
Represented By: Bruce T Bauer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriquest Mortgage Co.
Represented By: Ivo Keller
Represented By: Brian T. Harvey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc.
Represented By: Ivo Keller
Represented By: Brian T. Harvey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust
Represented By: Bruce T Bauer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town and Country Title Services
Represented By: Brian T. Harvey
Represented By: Ivo Keller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citi Residential Lending
Represented By: Stefanie Ann Schiff
Represented By: Donald M. Scotten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeward Residential, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce T Bauer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Default Services, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce T Bauer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Dick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Dick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]