Rau v. Mission Ranch Primary Care et al

Plaintiff: Bryn Rau
Defendant: Mission Ranch Primary Care and Marcia F. Nelson
Case Number: 2:2013cv00371
Filed: February 25, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Referring Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/21/2013 ORDERING 8 Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's eighth, ninth, and twelfth claims is GRANTED without prejudice; 8 Motion for More Definite Statement is DENIED; 8 Motion to Strike plaintiff's seventh claim is GRANTED; Plaintiff must file an amended complaint consonant with FRCP 11 and the directions in this order within 21 days of the date of this order. (Waggoner, D)
July 31, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/30/13. Plaintiff's counsel shall Show Cause by 7/31/2013 why plaintiff should not be sanctioned for failure to prosecute. (Manzer, C)
August 27, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/27/2013 ORDERING plaintiff's counsel to respond within seven days from the date of this order to show cause why she should not be sanctioned in the amount of $250 for not complyin g with this court's repeated orders to file an amended complaint. If plaintiff's counsel does not comply with this order, the court additionally may report plaintiff's counsel to the State Bar and dismiss this action for failure to prosecute.(Waggoner, D)
September 10, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/9/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's counsel is sanctioned in the amount of $250.00. Counsel shall not pass this cost on to her client. The 20 First Amended Complaint is STRICKEN. (Manzer, C)
October 22, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/21/13: Counsel is now directed to show cause within seven days of the date of this order why she should not be sanctioned an additional $500 for her failure to pay the initial sanction. Failure to respond to this order will result in a report to the State Bar of California. (Kaminski, H)
April 15, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/14/2014 GRANTING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute; DENYING AS MOOT 32 Motion to Amend the Complaint. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rau v. Mission Ranch Primary Care et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryn Rau
Represented By: Joann Leigh Pheasant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Ranch Primary Care
Represented By: Kelli Michelle Kennaday
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia F. Nelson
Represented By: Kelli Michelle Kennaday
Represented By: Stacy Marie Hunter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]