Mullins et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Worlanda F. Mullins and Bruce A. Mullins
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00453
Filed: March 6, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/24/13 ORDERING that Wells Fargo's request for judicial notice 8 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Wells Fargo's MOTION to DISMISS 7 is GRANTED, but with leave to amend. Pl aintiffs shall file an amended complaint in accordance with this order within 28 days. Alternatively, plaintiffs may file a notice of voluntary dismissal of their claims without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) (A)(i) of the FRCP within 28 days. Failure to file either an amended complaint or a notice of voluntary dismissal within 28 days of this order may result in a recommendation that the action be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b). (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 2, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/1/13 ORDERING that the 16 Motion to Amend the Complaint is DENIED as moot; the 16 proposed first amended complaint is deemed filed as the operative first amended complaint; defendant Wells Fargo shall respond within 21 days. (Manzer, C)
August 5, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/5/13 ORDERING that the August 15, 2013 hearing on defendants motion to dismiss is VACATED. Plaintiffs shall file and serve an opposition, or statement of non-opposition, to defendants motion within 21 days of this order. Defendant may file a reply to plaintiffs opposition, if any, within 21 days of service with the opposition. Thereafter, the matter will be submitted upon the record and briefs on file.(Dillon, M)
September 18, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/17/13 ORDERING that Wells Fargo's request for judicial notice 19 is GRANTED. The November 7, 2013 status (pre-trial scheduling) conference in this matter is VACATED. RECOMMENDING that Motion to dismiss 18 be GRANTED. The action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. F&R referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Kaminski, H)
September 19, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/19/2013 ORDERING 25 , 26 Plaintiffs' amended opposition and amended proposed order are STRICKEN. Apart from any objections that plaintiffs may submit to the district judge in response to the findings and recommendations, the court will disregard any further briefs, amendments, and/or other filings by plaintiffs in this case until the findings and recommendations are resolve. (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mullins et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: David Michael Newman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Worlanda F. Mullins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce A. Mullins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]