In Re: Zacky Farms, LLC

Trustee: August B. Landis and Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)
Creditor: Unsecured Creditors Committee and Western Milling, LLC
Debtor: Zacky Farms, LLC
Appellant: American Huntsman, LLC, Big Feather Ranch, LLC, Lucky Wishbone Ranch, LLC, Integrated Grain & Milling, Inc., ZF Enterprises, LLC and Richard Zacky
Case Number: 2:2013cv00455
Filed: March 7, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/27/2013 ORDERING that Appellants' opening brief shall be due on 9/27/2013. The appellee's opening brief shall be due within fourteen (14) days after service of Appellants' open ing brief. Appellants may file a reply brief with the District Court, within fourteen (14) days after service of appellee's opening brief. Once all briefs have been submitted, the Appellants are to notify the court in writing, within fourteen (14) days after service of Appellants' reply brief, that the appeal is ready for oral argument. (Zignago, K.)
September 26, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/26/2013 ORDERING that Appellants' opening brief shall be due on 10/28/2013. The appellee's opening brief shall be due within fourteen (14) days after service of Appellants' open ing brief. Appellants may file a reply brief with the District Court, within fourteen (14) days after service of appellee's opening brief. Once all briefs have been submitted, the Appellants are to notify the court in writing, within fourteen (14) days after service of Appellants' reply brief, that the appeal is ready for oral argument. (Zignago, K.)
October 24, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/23/2013 ORDERING that the appellants' opening brief be filed by 12/17/2013; ORDERING that the appellee's opening brief be filed fourteen (14) days after service of the appellants� 39; opening brief; ORDERING that the appellants file any reply brief with the District Court, within fourteen (14) days of service of appellee's opening brief; ORDERING the appellants to notify the court, in writing, within fourteen (14) days of service of the appellants' reply brief, that the appeal is ready for oral argument. (Michel, G)
December 4, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/3/13: The instant Appeal is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Parties shall bear their own attorney's fees and costs. (Kaminski, H)
May 23, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/22/13 ORDERING Appellants' opening brief due 7/8/13; the appellee's opening brief shall be due within 14 days after service of Appellants' opening brief. Appellants may file a reply brief with the District Court, within 14 days after service of appellee's opening brief. Once all briefs have been submitted, the Appellants are to notify the court in writing, within 14 days after service of Appellants' reply brief, that the appeal is ready for oral argument. (Meuleman, A)
July 3, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/3/13 ORDERING that Appellant's brief shall be due on 7/29/13. The appellee's opening brief shall be due within fourteen (14) days after service of Appellants' opening brief. Once all briefs have been submitted, the Appellants are to notify the court in writing, within fourteen (14) days after service of Appellants' reply brief, that the appeal is ready for oral argument. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 29, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/26/13 ORDERING that Appellant's Brief shall be due on 8/28/2013. The appellee's opening brief shall be due within fourteen (14) days after service of Appellants' opening brief. Appellants may file a reply brief with the District Court, within fourteen (14) days after service of appellee's opening brief. Once all briefs have been submitted, the Appellants are to notify the court in writing, within fourteen (14) days after service of Appellants' reply brief, that the appeal is ready for oral argument. (Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Zacky Farms, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: August B. Landis
Represented By: Antonia Gael Darling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Unsecured Creditors Committee
Represented By: Dale L Bratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Western Milling, LLC
Represented By: Alan Glenn Tippie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Zacky Farms, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Willoughby
Represented By: Jennifer E Niemann
Represented By: Donald W Fitzgerald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: American Huntsman, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Harold Armstrong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Big Feather Ranch, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Harold Armstrong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lucky Wishbone Ranch, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Harold Armstrong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Integrated Grain & Milling, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Adelos Gorton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ZF Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Michael Marchini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Richard Zacky
Represented By: Joseph Michael Marchini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]